UT SB0019 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-09 - House/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-09 - House/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Voter Information Pamphlets
Title
Voter Information Pamphlets
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-09 - House - House/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - House - House/ motion to reconsider (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House/ failed (Y: 29 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2012-02-02 - House - House/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-01-26 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - House - House/ motion to reconsider (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House/ failed (Y: 29 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2012-02-02 - House - House/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-01-26 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-09 | House/ substituted in HSUB | |
2012-02-09 | House/ uncircled in H3RDSB | |
2012-02-03 | House/ circled in H3RDSB | |
2012-02-03 | House/ placed back on 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDSB | |
2012-02-03 | House/ motion to reconsider in HCLERK | |
2012-02-02 | House/ failed in HCLERK | |
2012-02-02 | House/ floor amendment in H3RDSB | |
2012-02-02 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB | |
2012-02-01 | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDSB | |
2012-02-01 | House/ committee report favorable in HSTGOC | |
2012-02-01 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTGOC | |
2012-01-27 | House/ to standing committee in HSTGOC | |
2012-01-27 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2012-01-26 | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK | |
2012-01-26 | Senate/ to House in HCLERK | |
2012-01-26 | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK | |
2012-01-26 | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD | |
2012-01-25 | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD | |
2012-01-25 | Senate/ uncircled in S2ND | |
2012-01-24 | Senate/ circled in S2ND | |
2012-01-24 | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND | |
2012-01-23 | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2012-01-23 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2012-01-23 | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SINTRO | |
2012-01-19 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2012-01-18 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in LRGC | |
2012-01-13 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in LRGC | |
2011-12-19 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2011-12-13 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC | |
2011-10-26 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2011-10-26 | LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis in LRGC |
Subjects
Elections
Government Operations (State Issues)
Initiatives / Referendums
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Government Operations (State Issues)
Initiatives / Referendums
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)