UT SB0013 | 2020 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-28 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-28 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Native American Legislative Liaison Committee Amendments
Title
Native American Legislative Liaison Committee Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-28 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2020-03-28 | Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2020-03-28 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-20 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2020-02-26 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2020-02-26 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2020-02-26 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2020-02-26 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2020-02-26 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2020-02-26 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker |
2020-02-26 | House | House/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2020-02-26 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2020-02-26 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2020-02-24 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2020-02-24 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2020-02-21 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2020-02-20 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2020-02-18 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2020-02-18 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate Consent Calendar |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate Consent Calendar |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Printing in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2020-01-25 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-12-20 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-12-20 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-12-20 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-12-20 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Economic Development
Heritage and Arts
Indian Affairs
Legislative Committees and Task Forces
Legislative Operations
Legislature
Sunset Legislation
Heritage and Arts
Indian Affairs
Legislative Committees and Task Forces
Legislative Operations
Legislature
Sunset Legislation