UT SB0013 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Per Diem and Travel Modifications
Title
Per Diem and Travel Modifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-02 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-25 | Governor Signed in LTGOV | |
2011-03-17 | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC | |
2011-03-16 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC | |
2011-02-03 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2011-02-03 | Senate/ received from House in SPRES | |
2011-02-02 | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES | |
2011-02-02 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB | |
2011-02-01 | House/ committee report favorable in HSTGOC | |
2011-01-27 | House/ to standing committee in HSTGOC | |
2011-01-26 | House/ received from Senate in HINTRO | |
2011-01-26 | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK | |
2011-01-25 | Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in S3RD | |
2011-01-25 | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND | |
2011-01-24 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2011-01-11 | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in LRGC | |
2011-01-03 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in LRGC | |
2010-12-15 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC | |
2010-10-25 | LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis in LRGC |
Subjects
Department of Administrative Services
Executive Branch
Government Operations (State Issues)
State Officers and Employees
Executive Branch
Government Operations (State Issues)
State Officers and Employees