UT SB0008 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-01 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-01 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environmental Quality Base Budget
Title
Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environmental Quality Base Budget
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-01 | Senate/ substituted in SSUB | |
2011-02-01 | Senate/ lifted from Rules in S2ND | |
2011-01-25 | Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in SINTRO | |
2011-01-22 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in LRGC | |
2011-01-21 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2011-01-21 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC | |
2011-01-19 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2011/htmdoc/sbillhtm/SB0008.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2011/bills/sbillint/sb0008.pdf |