UT SB0004 | 2014 | Regular Session
Note: Legislation replaced by SB0004S01
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-04 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-04 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Business, Economic Development, and Labor Base Budget
Title
Business, Economic Development, and Labor Base Budget
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Shiozawa [R] | Rep. Jim Bird [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-04 | Senate | Senate/ substituted in SSUB |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Printing in SINTRO |
2014-01-07 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in LRGC | |
2013-12-20 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in LRGC | |
2013-12-20 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2013-12-20 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-12-20 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
SB0004S01 (Replaced by) 2014-02-19 - Governor Signed in LTGOV