UT SB0003 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 17 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-28 - Governor Line Item Veto in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriations Adjustments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriations Adjustments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-09 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 68 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-28 Governor Line Item Veto in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
2017-03-20 Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor
2017-03-20SenateSenate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary
2017-03-17SenateSenate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary
2017-03-17SenateEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary
2017-03-17 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2017-03-17 Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2017-03-09 Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2017-03-09SenateSenate/ received from House in Senate President
2017-03-09SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate President
2017-03-09SenateHouse/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President
2017-03-09HouseHouse/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker
2017-03-09HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2017-03-09HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2017-03-09HouseHouse/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2017-03-09HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2017-03-09HouseHouse/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2017-03-09HouseSenate/ to House in Clerk of the House
2017-03-09HouseSenate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Clerk of the House
2017-03-09SenateSenate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2017-03-09SenateSenate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2017-03-09SenateSenate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2017-03-09SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2017-03-09SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2017-03-09SenateSenate/ received bill from Legislative Printing in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2017-03-09 LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2017-03-09 LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2017-03-09 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2017-03-09 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2017-03-09 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback