UT SB0002 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 17 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-30 - Governor Line Item Veto in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Public Education Budget Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Education Budget Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate/ concurs with House amendment (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 63 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House/ floor amendment failed # 2 (Y: 26 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-30 Governor Line Item Veto in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
2016-03-18 Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor
2016-03-18SenateSenate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary
2016-03-17SenateSenate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary
2016-03-17SenateEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary
2016-03-17 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2016-03-09 Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2016-03-09 Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2016-03-09SenateSenate/ received from House in Senate President
2016-03-08SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate President
2016-03-08SenateHouse/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President
2016-03-08HouseHouse/ received from Senate in House Speaker
2016-03-08HouseSenate/ to House in House Speaker
2016-03-08HouseSenate/ concurs with House amendment in House Speaker
2016-03-08SenateSenate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in Senate Concurrence Calendar
2016-03-08SenateSenate/ received from House in Senate Secretary
2016-03-08SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2016-03-08SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
2016-03-08HouseHouse/ floor amendment failed # 2 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2016-03-08HouseHouse/ floor amendment # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2016-03-08HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2016-03-07HouseHouse/ 2nd suspended in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2016-03-07HouseHouse/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2016-03-07HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2016-03-07 House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2016-03-07 Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House
2016-03-07 Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House
2016-03-07 Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Clerk of the House
2016-03-07SenateSenate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2016-03-07SenateSenate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2016-03-07SenateSenate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2016-03-07SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2016-03-07SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2016-03-07 Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2016-03-07 LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2016-03-07 LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2016-03-07 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2016-03-07 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2016-03-07 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback