UT HR0902 | 2021 | 1st House Extraordinary Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 24 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-25 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 24 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-25 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Declaring Support for the Right to Keep and Bear Arms and Exploring Sanctuary State Status
Title
House Resolution Declaring Support for the Right to Keep and Bear Arms and Exploring Sanctuary State Status
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-19 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-25 | House/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2021-05-25 | House | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House |
2021-05-24 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2021-05-24 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2021-05-21 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-05-21 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-05-19 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-05-19 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-05-19 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker |
2021-05-19 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-05-19 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-05-19 | House | House/ 2nd suspended in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-05-19 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-05-19 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-05-19 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2021-05-19 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-05-19 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-05-19 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-05-19 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |