UT HR0005 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 23 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-23 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 23 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-23 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
House Committee Name Change Resolution
Title
House Committee Name Change Resolution
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Bird [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-16 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-13 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-23 | House/ to Lieutenant Governor in LTGOV | |
2012-02-23 | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in HCLERK | |
2012-02-23 | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK | |
2012-02-22 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK | |
2012-02-17 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2012-02-16 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2012-02-16 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2012-02-16 | House/ passed 3rd reading in HSPKR | |
2012-02-16 | House/ 3rd reading in HCON | |
2012-02-14 | House/ 2nd reading in HCON | |
2012-02-14 | House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in HSTWED | |
2012-02-13 | House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in HSTWED | |
2012-02-13 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTWED | |
2012-02-10 | House/ to standing committee in HSTWED | |
2012-02-10 | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-10 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-10 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-09 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-09 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK | |
2012-02-08 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2012-02-08 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-02-08 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC | |
2012-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2012-02-04 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-02-03 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |