UT HR0003 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 6 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-06 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 6 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-06 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
House Rules Resolution
Title
House Rules Resolution
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-02 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-29 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-06 | House/ to Lieutenant Governor in LTGOV | |
2012-03-06 | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in HCLERK | |
2012-03-06 | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK | |
2012-03-06 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK | |
2012-03-05 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2012-03-02 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2012-03-02 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2012-03-02 | House/ passed 3rd reading in HSPKR | |
2012-03-02 | House/ 3rd reading in HCON | |
2012-02-29 | House/ 2nd reading in HCON | |
2012-02-29 | House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-29 | House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-29 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-29 | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-28 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-28 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-24 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-24 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK | |
2012-02-24 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2012-02-24 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-02-24 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC | |
2012-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2012-02-04 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-02-03 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |