UT HR0002 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 25 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-26 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 25 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-26 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution -- Rules Committee Process
Title
House Resolution -- Rules Committee Process
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-24 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-26 | House/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2016-02-25 | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House | |
2016-02-25 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House | |
2016-02-25 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2016-02-24 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2016-02-24 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2016-02-24 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker |
2016-02-24 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House Consent Calendar |
2016-02-22 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House Consent Calendar |
2016-02-22 | House | House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in House Rules Committee |
2016-02-19 | House | House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in House Rules Committee |
2016-02-19 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Rules Committee |
2016-02-19 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2016-02-18 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2016-02-18 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2016-02-18 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House | |
2016-02-18 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2016-02-18 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2016-02-18 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |