UT HR0002 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-26 - House/ uncircled in H3RDHB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-26 - House/ uncircled in H3RDHB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Rules Changes Resolution
Title
House Rules Changes Resolution
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-26 | House/ uncircled in H3RDHB | |
2011-01-25 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB | |
2011-01-24 | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDHB | |
2011-01-24 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HINTRO | |
2011-01-22 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in LRGC | |
2011-01-21 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2011-01-21 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2011/htmdoc/hbillhtm/HR0002.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2011/bills/hbillint/hr0002.pdf |