UT HR0001 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 15 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-16 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 15 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-16 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Urging Restorative Justice in Utah's Education System
Title
House Resolution Urging Restorative Justice in Utah's Education System
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 48 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-16 | House/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2018-03-15 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2018-03-15 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2018-03-05 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2018-03-05 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2018-02-27 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2018-02-27 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker |
2018-02-27 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2018-02-16 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2018-02-16 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in House Education Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Education Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Education Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Education Committee |
2018-02-07 | House | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in House Education Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Education Committee |
2018-01-25 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2018-01-23 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2018-01-23 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2018-01-22 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2018-01-22 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |