UT HJR024 | 2020 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 20 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-23 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 20 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-23 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Extending the State of Emergency Due to Infectious Disease Covid-19 Novel Coronavirus
Title
Joint Resolution Extending the State of Emergency Due to Infectious Disease Covid-19 Novel Coronavirus
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Ray [R] | Sen. Ann Millner [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-23 | House/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2020-03-23 | House | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-20 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-20 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-16 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2020-03-16 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2020-03-12 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2020-03-12 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2020-03-12 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2020-03-12 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate President |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2020-03-11 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-11 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-11 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2020-03-11 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2020-03-11 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2020-03-11 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2020-03-11 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2020-03-11 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2020-03-11 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-11 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-03-11 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-03-11 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Emergency Management
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Legislative Operations
Public Safety
Resolutions
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Legislative Operations
Public Safety
Resolutions