UT HJR024 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-04 - House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in HSTRUL
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-04 - House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in HSTRUL
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution on Equal Treatment by Government
Title
Joint Resolution on Equal Treatment by Government
Sponsors
Rep. Curtis Oda [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-12 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-04 | House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-16 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB | |
2010-02-16 | House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in HSPEC | |
2010-02-15 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSPEC | |
2010-02-12 | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB | |
2010-02-12 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTBUS | |
2010-02-10 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-10 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HDOCKET | |
2010-02-10 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |
Subjects
Antidiscrimination
Business
Constitution
Counties
Education
Government Operations (State Issues)
Labor
Local Districts
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Public Education
Resolutions
Resolutions, Constitutional
Business
Constitution
Counties
Education
Government Operations (State Issues)
Labor
Local Districts
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Public Education
Resolutions
Resolutions, Constitutional