UT HJR021 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 16 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-18 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 16 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-18 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution on the Sovereign Character of Pilt--payment in Lieu of Taxes
Title
Joint Resolution on the Sovereign Character of Pilt--payment in Lieu of Taxes
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Ivory [R] | Sen. David Hinkins [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 57 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 57 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | House/ to Lieutenant Governor in LTGOV | |
2014-03-16 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK |
2014-03-16 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK |
2014-03-12 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2014-03-12 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2014-03-12 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2014-03-12 | House | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR |
2014-03-11 | House | Senate/ to House in HSPKR |
2014-03-11 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in SPRES |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in S2ND |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ circled in S2ND |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in S2ND |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO |
2014-03-06 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SSEC |
2014-03-06 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC |
2014-03-06 | House | House/ uncircled in H3RDHB |
2014-03-06 | House | House/ circled in H3RDHB |
2014-03-06 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB |
2014-03-05 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDHB |
2014-03-05 | House | House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in HSTRUL |
2014-02-27 | House | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB |
2014-02-27 | House | House/ committee report favorable in HSTNAE |
2014-02-26 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTNAE |
2014-02-26 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTNAE |
2014-02-25 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTNAE |
2014-02-25 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTNAE |
2014-02-25 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTNAE |
2014-02-20 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2014-02-20 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK |
2014-02-20 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2014-02-20 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2014-02-20 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |