UT HJR021 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 16 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-16 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 16 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-16 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution on State Health Insurance
Title
Joint Resolution on State Health Insurance
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Dee [R] | Sen. Scott Jenkins [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-16 | House/ to Lieutenant Governor in LTGOV | |
2012-03-16 | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in HCLERK | |
2012-03-16 | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK | |
2012-03-16 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK | |
2012-03-14 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2012-03-09 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2012-03-09 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2012-03-09 | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR | |
2012-03-08 | Senate/ to House in HSPKR | |
2012-03-08 | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR | |
2012-03-08 | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in SPRES | |
2012-03-08 | Senate/ uncircled in S2ND | |
2012-03-08 | Senate/ circled in S2ND | |
2012-03-08 | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in S2ND | |
2012-03-08 | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2012-03-06 | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTRUL | |
2012-03-06 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTRUL | |
2012-03-06 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2012-03-05 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SINTRO | |
2012-03-05 | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO | |
2012-03-05 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2012-03-05 | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC | |
2012-03-05 | House/ uncircled in H3RDHB | |
2012-03-05 | House/ circled in H3RDHB | |
2012-03-05 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB | |
2012-03-05 | House/ 2nd reading/ suspension in H3RDHB | |
2012-03-05 | House/ lifted from Rules in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-29 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-29 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK | |
2012-02-29 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2012-02-29 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-02-29 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |