UT HJR020 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 15 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-16 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 15 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-16 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Submitting a Question to Voters
Title
Joint Resolution Submitting a Question to Voters
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 55 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House/ floor amendment failed (Y: 19 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2018-03-08 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 55 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House/ floor amendment failed (Y: 19 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-16 | House/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2018-03-15 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2018-03-15 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2018-03-15 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2018-03-15 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2018-03-08 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2018-03-08 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2018-03-08 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2018-03-08 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate President |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2018-03-08 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Secretary |
2018-03-08 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Secretary |
2018-03-08 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2018-03-08 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2018-03-08 | House | House/ floor amendment # 3 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2018-03-08 | House | House/ floor amendment failed in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2018-03-08 | House | House/ floor amendment failed in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2018-03-08 | House | House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2018-03-08 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2018-03-07 | House | House/ 2nd suspended in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2018-03-07 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2018-03-07 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2018-03-06 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2018-03-06 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2018-03-06 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2018-03-06 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |