UT HJR018 | 2024 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 8 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 8 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution for Education That Encourages Free Enterprise and Entrepreneurship
Title
Joint Resolution for Education That Encourages Free Enterprise and Entrepreneurship
Sponsors
Rep. Steven Lund [R] | Sen. Don Ipson [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-11 | House/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2024-03-11 | House | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House |
2024-03-08 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2024-03-08 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2024-02-22 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2024-02-22 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2024-02-21 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2024-02-21 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2024-02-21 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2024-02-21 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Senate President |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate Consent Calendar |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate Consent Calendar |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in Senate Education Committee |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in Senate Education Committee |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Education Committee |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Education Committee |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2024-02-12 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2024-02-08 | House | House/ held in House Docket Clerk |
2024-02-08 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2024-02-08 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House Consent Calendar |
2024-02-06 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House Consent Calendar |
2024-02-06 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Education Committee |
2024-02-05 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Education Committee |
2024-01-30 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Education Committee |
2024-01-29 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2024-01-26 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2024-01-25 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2024-01-25 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2024-01-24 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-01-24 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-01-24 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |