UT HJR017 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution on Eliminating Federal Regulation and Granting Nurse Anesthetists a Full Scope of Practice Through a State Opt Out
Title
Joint Resolution on Eliminating Federal Regulation and Granting Nurse Anesthetists a Full Scope of Practice Through a State Opt Out
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-07 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-05 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | House | House/ filed in HFILE |
2013-03-14 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in HCLERK |
2013-03-07 | House | House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in HSTRUL |
2013-03-07 | House | House/ circled in H3RDHB |
2013-03-07 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB |
2013-03-05 | House | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB |
2013-03-05 | House | House/ committee report favorable in HSTHHS |
2013-03-05 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTHHS |
2013-03-05 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTHHS |
2013-03-04 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTHHS |
2013-03-04 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTHHS |
2013-03-01 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTHHS |
2013-02-28 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2013-02-28 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK |
2013-02-28 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2013-02-28 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-02-28 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |