UT HJR014 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 14 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 14 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Rules Resolution - Legislative Procedure Revisions
Title
Joint Rules Resolution - Legislative Procedure Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-25 - House - House/ concurs with Senate amendment (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 54 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 54 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2022-03-14 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-14 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-01 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-03-01 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-02-28 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-02-28 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2022-02-28 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2022-02-28 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2022-02-25 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2022-02-25 | Senate | House/ concurs with Senate amendment in Senate President |
2022-02-25 | House | House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in House Concurrence Calendar |
2022-02-25 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-25 | House | Senate/ to House with amendments in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-25 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ amended in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2022-02-16 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-16 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-16 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-14 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-14 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-12 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-11 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-11 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-08 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-02-08 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
JR3 | 2 | 902 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
JR3 | 2 | 903 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
JR4 | 2 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
JR4 | 2 | 401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
JR4 | 2 | 501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
JR4 | 2 | 505 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
JR4 | 3 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
JR4 | 3 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
JR4 | 3 | 302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
JR4 | 5 | 104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
JR5 | 2 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
JR5 | 2 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
JR7 | 1 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
JR7 | 1 | 405 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
JR7 | 1 | 601 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
JR7 | 1 | 602 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
JR7 | 1 | 603 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
JR7 | 1 | 604 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
JR7 | 1 | 605 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
JR7 | 1 | 606 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
JR7 | 1 | 607 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
JR7 | 1 | 608 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
JR7 | 1 | 609 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
JR7 | 1 | 610 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
JR7 | 1 | 611 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |