UT HJR012 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 15 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-16 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 15 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-16 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Calling upon the Attorney General to Sue Prescription Opioid Manufacturers
Title
Joint Resolution Calling upon the Attorney General to Sue Prescription Opioid Manufacturers
Sponsors
Sen. Mike McKell [R] | Sen. Jim Dabakis [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - House - House/ concurs with Senate amendment (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-16 | House/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2018-03-15 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2018-03-15 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2018-03-13 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2018-03-13 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2018-03-13 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2018-03-12 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2018-03-09 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2018-03-09 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2018-03-08 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2018-03-08 | Senate | House/ concurs with Senate amendment in Senate President |
2018-03-08 | House | House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in House Concurrence Calendar |
2018-03-08 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2018-03-08 | House | Senate/ to House with amendments in Clerk of the House |
2018-03-08 | House | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Clerk of the House |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ amended in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2018-02-27 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2018-02-27 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2018-02-27 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2018-02-27 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2018-02-27 | House | House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2018-02-21 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Judiciary Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Judiciary Committee |
2018-02-15 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Judiciary Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2018-02-09 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2018-02-09 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2018-02-09 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2018-02-09 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2018-02-09 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |