UT HJR010 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution on Legislator Eligibility
Title
Joint Resolution on Legislator Eligibility
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-01-30 - House - House Comm - Returned to Rules (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-01-26 - House - House Comm - Lifted from Table (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - House Comm - Tabled (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - House - House Comm - Lifted from Table (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - House Comm - Tabled (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | House/ filed in HFILE | |
2012-03-08 | House/ strike enacting clause in HCLERK | |
2012-01-31 | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in HSTRUL | |
2012-01-30 | House Comm - Returned to Rules in HSTGOC | |
2012-01-26 | House Comm - Lifted from Table in HSTGOC | |
2012-01-25 | House Comm - Tabled in HSTGOC | |
2012-01-24 | House/ to standing committee in HSTGOC | |
2012-01-23 | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL | |
2012-01-23 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2012-01-20 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK | |
2012-01-14 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in LRGC | |
2012-01-14 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in LRGC | |
2012-01-09 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2012-01-09 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-01-09 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |