UT HJR008 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Applying for an Article V Amendments Convention
Title
Joint Resolution Applying for an Article V Amendments Convention
Sponsors
Rep. Bradley Daw [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | House/ filed in HFILE | |
2012-03-08 | House/ strike enacting clause in HCLERK | |
2012-03-01 | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in HSTRUL | |
2012-03-01 | House Comm - Returned to Rules in HSTJUD | |
2012-02-17 | House/ to standing committee in HSTJUD | |
2012-02-02 | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-02 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-02 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL | |
2012-01-30 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2012-01-30 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK | |
2012-01-30 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2012-01-30 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-01-27 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2012/htmdoc/hbillhtm/HJR008.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2012/bills/hbillint/hjr008.pdf |