UT HJR005 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution for Gender Reassignment Surgical Health Benefits
Title
Joint Resolution for Gender Reassignment Surgical Health Benefits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-03 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2023-03-03 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2023-01-17 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2023-01-17 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2023-01-16 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Clerk of the House |
2023-01-14 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Clerk of the House |
2023-01-11 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2023-01-06 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2023-01-06 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2023-01-06 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Health
Health Care
Health Insurance
Legislative Operations
Mental Health
Public Employees' Health Program
Resolutions
Resolutions, Rules
Health Care
Health Insurance
Legislative Operations
Mental Health
Public Employees' Health Program
Resolutions
Resolutions, Rules
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/static/HJR005.html |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/hbillint/HJR005.pdf |
Supplement | https://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2023/HJR005.fn.pdf |