UT HJR005 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 26 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-26 - House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 26 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-26 - House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution on Clean Air
Title
Joint Resolution on Clean Air
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-24 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-26 | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK | |
2010-02-25 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2010-02-24 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2010-02-24 | Senate/ to House in HSPKR | |
2010-02-24 | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in SPRES | |
2010-02-23 | Senate/ placed on Time Certain Calendar in SSPEC | |
2010-02-23 | Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in SSTNAE | |
2010-02-22 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTNAE | |
2010-02-17 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2010-02-17 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2010-02-17 | House/ floor amendment in H3RDHB | |
2010-02-09 | House/ circled in H3RDHB | |
2010-02-03 | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB | |
2010-02-03 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTHHS | |
2010-01-27 | House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in HSTRUL | |
2010-01-27 | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in HDOCKET | |
2010-01-27 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in LRGC | |
2010-01-26 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2010-01-26 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |