UT HJR004 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 7 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 7 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution on Breastfeeding
Title
Joint Resolution on Breastfeeding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-02-17 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-02-17 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-07 | House/ to Lieutenant Governor in LTGOV | |
2012-03-07 | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK | |
2012-03-06 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK | |
2012-03-06 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2012-03-05 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2012-03-05 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2012-03-05 | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR | |
2012-03-05 | Senate/ to House in HSPKR | |
2012-03-05 | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR | |
2012-03-05 | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in SPRES | |
2012-03-05 | Senate/ 3rd reading in SCON | |
2012-02-29 | Senate/ 2nd reading in SCON | |
2012-02-29 | Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in SSTBUS | |
2012-02-29 | Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in SSTBUS | |
2012-02-29 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTBUS | |
2012-02-23 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTBUS | |
2012-02-21 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2012-02-21 | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO | |
2012-02-17 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2012-02-17 | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC | |
2012-02-17 | House/ 3rd reading in HCON | |
2012-02-15 | House/ 2nd reading in HCON | |
2012-02-15 | House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in HSTHHS | |
2012-02-15 | House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in HSTHHS | |
2012-02-15 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTHHS | |
2012-02-10 | House/ to standing committee in HSTHHS | |
2012-02-10 | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-10 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-10 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-09 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-09 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK | |
2012-02-08 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2012-02-08 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-02-08 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC | |
2012-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2012-02-04 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-02-03 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |