UT HJR003 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-09 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Joint Resolution Calling for a Convention to Amend the Constitution of the United States

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint Resolution Calling for a Convention to Amend the Constitution of the United States

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate/ failed (Y: 12 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 45 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-09HouseHouse/ filed in House file for bills not passed
2017-03-09HouseHouse/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House
2017-02-23HouseHouse/ filed in Clerk of the House
2017-02-23HouseSenate/ to House in Clerk of the House
2017-02-23SenateSenate/ failed in Senate Secretary
2017-02-23SenateSenate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2017-02-22SenateSenate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2017-02-22SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2017-02-16SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2017-02-16SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ substituted in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2017-02-14SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2017-02-14SenateSenate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2017-02-13SenateHouse/ to Printing with fiscal note in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2017-02-08SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2017-02-06SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2017-02-06SenateSenate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2017-02-03SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2017-02-03SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
2017-02-03HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2017-01-27HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2017-01-27HouseHouse/ committee report favorable in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2017-01-26HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2017-01-24HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2017-01-23HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2017-01-18HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House
2017-01-18HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2017-01-09 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2017-01-09 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback