UT HJR003 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 4 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-17 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 4 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-17 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Recognizing Sister City Relationship Between Magna, Utah, and Yuzawa, Niigata, Japan
Title
Joint Resolution Recognizing Sister City Relationship Between Magna, Utah, and Yuzawa, Niigata, Japan
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-02-20 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-02-20 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-17 | House/ to Lieutenant Governor in LTGOV | |
2014-03-04 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK |
2014-03-04 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK |
2014-03-03 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2014-02-28 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2014-02-28 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2014-02-28 | House | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR |
2014-02-28 | House | Senate/ to House in HSPKR |
2014-02-28 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in SPRES |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in SCON |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in SCON |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in SSTEDW |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in SSTEDW |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTEDW |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTEDW |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO |
2014-02-20 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SSEC |
2014-02-20 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC |
2014-02-20 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB |
2014-02-11 | House | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB |
2014-02-11 | House | House/ committee report favorable in HSTEDW |
2014-02-10 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTEDW |
2014-02-07 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTEDW |
2014-02-07 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL |
2014-02-06 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL |
2014-02-06 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL |
2014-02-06 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2014-02-06 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK |
2014-02-05 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2014-02-05 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2014-02-05 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |