UT HJR003 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution - Property Tax Exemption for Public Schools
Title
Joint Resolution - Property Tax Exemption for Public Schools
Sponsors
Rep. Derek Brown [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-11 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2013-02-11 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | House | House/ filed in HFILE |
2013-03-14 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in HCLERK |
2013-03-11 | House | House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in HSTRUL |
2013-03-11 | House | House/ circled in H3RDHB |
2013-03-08 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDHB |
2013-03-07 | House | House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in HSTRUL |
2013-02-21 | House | House/ circled in H3RDHB |
2013-02-21 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB |
2013-02-12 | House | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB |
2013-02-12 | House | House/ committee report favorable in HSTREV |
2013-02-11 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTREV |
2013-02-01 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTREV |
2013-01-31 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL |
2013-01-30 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL |
2013-01-30 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL |
2013-01-30 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2013-01-30 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK |
2013-01-29 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2013-01-29 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-01-29 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Subjects
Legislative Affairs
Property Tax
Public Education
Resolutions
Resolutions, Constitutional
Revenue and Taxation
Property Tax
Public Education
Resolutions
Resolutions, Constitutional
Revenue and Taxation