UT HCR301 | 2011 | 3rd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-17 - LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-17 - LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concurrent Resolution Recognizing the 75th Anniversary of the Welfare System of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-day Saints
Title
Concurrent Resolution Recognizing the 75th Anniversary of the Welfare System of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-day Saints
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-17 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in ELTGOV | |
2011-10-17 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in ELTGOV | |
2011-10-13 | Governor Signed in ELTGOV | |
2011-10-04 | House/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2011-10-04 | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK | |
2011-10-04 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK | |
2011-10-04 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2011-10-03 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2011-10-03 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2011-10-03 | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR | |
2011-10-03 | Senate/ to House in HSPKR | |
2011-10-03 | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR | |
2011-10-03 | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in SPRES | |
2011-10-03 | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in S2ND | |
2011-10-03 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2011-10-03 | Senate/ under suspension of the rules in SSTRUL | |
2011-10-03 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2011-10-03 | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO | |
2011-10-03 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2011-10-03 | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC | |
2011-10-03 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB | |
2011-10-03 | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in H3RDHB | |
2011-10-03 | House/ 2nd reading/ suspension in H3RDHB | |
2011-10-03 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2011-10-03 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HINTRO | |
2011-10-03 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2011-10-03 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2011-10-03 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2011S3/htmdoc/hbillhtm/HCR301.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2011S3/bills/hbillint/hcr301.pdf |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2011S3/bills/hbillenr/hcr301.pdf |