UT HCR201 | 2021 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-16 - Governor Signed in Executive Branch - Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-16 - Governor Signed in Executive Branch - Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concurrent Resolution Urging Congress and the President to Protect Consumer Privacy in Banking and Financial Transactions
Title
Concurrent Resolution Urging Congress and the President to Protect Consumer Privacy in Banking and Financial Transactions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-10 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-09 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-11-09 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-16 | Governor Signed in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2021-11-15 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2021-11-15 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2021-11-15 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2021-11-12 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-11-12 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-11-10 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-11-10 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2021-11-10 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2021-11-10 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2021-11-10 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate President |
2021-11-10 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-11-09 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-11-09 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2021-11-09 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2021-11-09 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2021-11-09 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-11-09 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-11-09 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-11-09 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-11-09 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Clerk of the House |
2021-11-09 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2021-11-09 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2021-11-08 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-11-08 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-11-08 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |