UT HCR021 | 2020 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concurrent Resolution Celebrating the 50th Anniversary of Earth Day
Title
Concurrent Resolution Celebrating the 50th Anniversary of Earth Day
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 65 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 65 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2020-03-12 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-12 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2020-03-02 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-02 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-02 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House Consent Calendar |
2020-02-27 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House Consent Calendar |
2020-02-27 | House | House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2020-02-25 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2020-02-20 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2020-02-20 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2020-02-20 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2020-02-20 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-02-19 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-02-19 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-02-19 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |