UT HCR017 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Concurrent Resolution Calling on Congress to Develop a Responsible Monetary Policy

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concurrent Resolution Calling on Congress to Develop a Responsible Monetary Policy

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-05 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 62 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08HouseHouse/ filed in House file for bills not passed
2018-03-08HouseHouse/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2018-03-08HouseSenate/ to House in Clerk of the House
2018-03-08SenateSenate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary
2018-03-06SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2018-03-06SenateSenate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2018-03-06SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2018-03-05HouseHouse/ held in House Docket Clerk
2018-03-05SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
2018-03-05HouseHouse/ floor amendment # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2018-03-05HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2018-03-02HouseHouse/ 2nd suspended in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2018-03-02HouseHouse/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2018-03-02HouseHouse/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in House Rules Committee
2018-02-27HouseHouse/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2018-02-27HouseHouse/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in House Rules Committee
2018-02-26HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2018-02-26HouseHouse/ committee report favorable in House Revenue and Taxation Committee
2018-02-26HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Revenue and Taxation Committee
2018-02-23HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Revenue and Taxation Committee
2018-02-23HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee
2018-02-22HouseLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee
2018-02-21HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2018-02-21HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2018-02-21 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2018-02-21 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2018-02-21 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback