UT HCR017 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concurrent Resolution Opposing Unilateral Use of the Antiquities Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concurrent Resolution Opposing Unilateral Use of the Antiquities Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-07 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 64 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-10HouseHouse/ filed in House file for bills not passed
2016-03-10 House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2016-03-10 Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House
2016-03-10SenateSenate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary
2016-03-10SenateSenate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2016-03-08SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2016-03-08 Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2016-03-07SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2016-03-07SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
2016-03-07HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2016-03-07HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2016-03-07HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2016-03-07HouseBill Substituted by Standing Committee in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2016-03-07HouseHouse/ to Printing with fiscal note in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2016-03-07HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2016-03-07HouseHouse Comm - Substitute Recommendation in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2016-03-07HouseLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2016-03-07HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2016-03-07HouseLFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in House Rules Committee
2016-03-02HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2016-03-02 House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2016-03-02 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2016-03-02 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback