UT HCR017 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concurrent Resolution Opposing the Use of Presidential Power to Create New National Monuments in Utah
Title
Concurrent Resolution Opposing the Use of Presidential Power to Create New National Monuments in Utah
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | Governor Signed in ELTGOV | |
2010-03-18 | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK | |
2010-03-16 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2010-03-11 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2010-03-11 | Senate/ to House in HSPKR | |
2010-03-11 | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in SPRES | |
2010-03-10 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2010-03-08 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SINTRO | |
2010-03-08 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2010-03-08 | House/ uncircled in H3RDHB | |
2010-03-06 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB | |
2010-03-04 | House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in HSTRUL | |
2010-03-02 | House/ comm rpt/ amended in H3RDHB | |
2010-03-02 | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation in HSTNAE | |
2010-03-01 | House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-26 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-25 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-25 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2010-02-25 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |