UT HCR015 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Concurrent Resolution Commending Jordan School District on its Fleet of Natural Gas School Buses
Title
Concurrent Resolution Commending Jordan School District on its Fleet of Natural Gas School Buses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2018-03-08 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2018-03-08 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ amended in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2018-02-26 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2018-02-26 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2018-02-26 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House Consent Calendar |
2018-02-23 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House Consent Calendar |
2018-02-23 | House | House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in House Transportation Committee |
2018-02-23 | House | House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in House Transportation Committee |
2018-02-23 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Transportation Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Transportation Committee |
2018-02-20 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2018-02-20 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2018-02-16 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2018-02-16 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2018-02-16 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Air
Clean Fuels
Education
Environmental Quality
Local Boards of Education
Natural Gas
Public Education
Resolutions
School Finance
Clean Fuels
Education
Environmental Quality
Local Boards of Education
Natural Gas
Public Education
Resolutions
School Finance