UT HCR014 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Concurrent Resolution Honoring Utah Olympians and Paralympians
Title
Concurrent Resolution Honoring Utah Olympians and Paralympians
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-04 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2022-02-16 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-16 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-16 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House Consent Calendar |
2022-02-14 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House Consent Calendar |
2022-02-14 | House | House/ comm rpt/ amended/ placed on Consent Cal in House Business and Labor Committee |
2022-02-14 | House | House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in House Business and Labor Committee |
2022-02-14 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Business and Labor Committee |
2022-02-14 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 in House Business and Labor Committee |
2022-02-14 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Business and Labor Committee |
2022-02-10 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Business and Labor Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-09 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-02-08 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-02-08 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-02-08 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |