UT HCR014 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Wild Lands Concurrent Resolution

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wild Lands Concurrent Resolution

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-03-01 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 67 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-10 House/ filed in HFILE
2011-03-10 Senate/ strike enacting clause in HCLERK
2011-03-02 Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL
2011-03-01 House/ to Senate in SSEC
2011-03-01 House/ uncircled in H3RDHB
2011-03-01 House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB
2011-02-24 House/ committee report favorable in HSTNAE
2011-02-22 House/ to standing committee in HSTNAE
2011-02-21 House/ to Printing with fiscal note in HSTRUL
2011-02-21 LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL
2011-02-17 House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HINTRO
2011-02-16 Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC
2011-02-05 Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC
2011-02-04 Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback