UT HCR013 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concurrent Resolution Regarding the Bridal Veil Falls Area
Title
Concurrent Resolution Regarding the Bridal Veil Falls Area
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2021-03-09 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2021-03-09 | House | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-05 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-05 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-04 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-04 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-03 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-03 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2021-03-02 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2021-03-02 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate President |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2021-02-19 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2021-02-19 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2021-02-19 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-02-17 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-02-17 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2021-02-16 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2021-02-16 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2021-02-11 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2021-02-11 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-08 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-02-08 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-02-08 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Business
Counties
Department of Natural Resources
Municipalities
Natural Resources
Parks and Recreation
Public Lands
State Parks and Recreation
Counties
Department of Natural Resources
Municipalities
Natural Resources
Parks and Recreation
Public Lands
State Parks and Recreation