UT HCR012 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concurrent Resolution Honoring the Friends of Utah State Parks
Title
Concurrent Resolution Honoring the Friends of Utah State Parks
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-04 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2022-02-18 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-18 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-18 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House Consent Calendar |
2022-02-16 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House Consent Calendar |
2022-02-16 | House | House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2022-02-11 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-08 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-08 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-02-07 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-02-07 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-02-07 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Department of Natural Resources
Division of State Parks
Legislative Operations
Natural Resources
Resolutions
Division of State Parks
Legislative Operations
Natural Resources
Resolutions