UT HCR011 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concurrent Resolution Recognizing Utah's Clerks and Election Workers for Their Performance Related to Utah's 2020 Election
Title
Concurrent Resolution Recognizing Utah's Clerks and Election Workers for Their Performance Related to Utah's 2020 Election
Sponsors
Rep. Joel Briscoe [D] | Sen. Gene Davis [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 43 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House/ substituted from # 1 to # 2 (Y: 41 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Comm - Motion to Table Failed (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-02-10 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 43 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House/ substituted from # 1 to # 2 (Y: 41 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Comm - Motion to Table Failed (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-02-10 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2021-03-15 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2021-03-15 | House | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-12 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-09 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-09 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-05 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-05 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2021-03-05 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2021-03-05 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate President |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-02-17 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2021-02-17 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2021-02-16 | House | House/ held in House Docket Clerk |
2021-02-16 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2021-02-16 | House | House/ substituted from # 1 to # 2 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-02-16 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-02-11 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-02-11 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Government Operations Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Government Operations Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | House Comm - Motion to Table Failed in House Government Operations Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Government Operations Committee |
2021-02-09 | House | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in House Government Operations Committee |
2021-02-05 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Government Operations Committee |
2021-02-04 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2021-02-03 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-02-03 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-03 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-02-03 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Constitutional Officers
Counties
Election Administration
Election Law
Government Operations (State Issues)
Lieutenant Governor
Municipalities
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Resolutions
Voting and Voter Registration
Counties
Election Administration
Election Law
Government Operations (State Issues)
Lieutenant Governor
Municipalities
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Resolutions
Voting and Voter Registration