UT HCR010 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-01 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-01 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concurrent Resolution on the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act and State Health Care Reform
Title
Concurrent Resolution on the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act and State Health Care Reform
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Ivory [R] | Sen. Stuart Adams [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-14 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 53 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-03-07 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 53 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-01 | Governor Signed in ELTGOV | |
2013-03-21 | House/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2013-03-21 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK |
2013-03-21 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK |
2013-03-19 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2013-03-14 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2013-03-14 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2013-03-14 | House | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR |
2013-03-14 | House | Senate/ to House in HSPKR |
2013-03-14 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in SPRES |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in S2ND |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO |
2013-03-07 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SSEC |
2013-03-07 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC |
2013-03-07 | House | House/ uncircled in H3RDHB |
2013-03-07 | House | House/ circled in H3RDHB |
2013-03-07 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB |
2013-03-05 | House | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB |
2013-03-05 | House | House/ comm rpt/ amended in HSTBUS |
2013-03-05 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTBUS |
2013-03-05 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation in HSTBUS |
2013-03-04 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTBUS |
2013-03-01 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTBUS |
2013-03-01 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTBUS |
2013-03-01 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTBUS |
2013-02-26 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2013-02-26 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK |
2013-02-26 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2013-02-26 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-02-26 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |