UT HCR009 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concurrent Resolution Encouraging Consideration of a Later School Day Start for High School
Title
Concurrent Resolution Encouraging Consideration of a Later School Day Start for High School
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 46 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 46 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2017-03-09 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2017-03-09 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Education Committee |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Education Committee |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Education Committee |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2017-02-23 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2017-02-23 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2017-02-23 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2017-02-10 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2017-02-10 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Education Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Education Committee |
2017-01-30 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Education Committee |
2017-01-30 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2017-01-27 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2017-01-26 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2017-01-26 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2017-01-25 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2017-01-25 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2017-01-25 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |