UT HCR007 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-23 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-23 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Credit Scores Concurrent Resolution
Title
Credit Scores Concurrent Resolution
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-09 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-23 | Governor Signed in ELTGOV | |
2010-03-10 | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK | |
2010-03-10 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2010-03-09 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2010-03-09 | Senate/ to House in HSPKR | |
2010-03-09 | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in SPRES | |
2010-03-08 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2010-03-03 | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in SSTRUL | |
2010-02-24 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTBUS | |
2010-02-24 | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO | |
2010-02-23 | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC | |
2010-02-23 | House/ uncircled in H3RDHB | |
2010-02-18 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB | |
2010-02-16 | House/ comm rpt/ amended in HSTLAW | |
2010-02-12 | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation in HSTLAW | |
2010-02-09 | House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-08 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-04 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-03 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2010-02-03 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |