UT HCR006 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-12 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-12 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substitute Concurrent Resolution on Payment Options for State Services
Title
Substitute Concurrent Resolution on Payment Options for State Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-06 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 38 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 38 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2015-03-12 | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House | |
2015-03-12 | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House | |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2015-03-04 | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate | |
2015-03-03 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2015-03-03 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2015-03-03 | House | House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2015-03-03 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2015-02-27 | House | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2015-02-26 | House | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2015-02-24 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2015-02-24 | House | House/ comm rpt/ amended in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2015-02-24 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2015-02-24 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2015-02-19 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2015-02-11 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2015-02-10 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2015-02-10 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House | |
2015-02-10 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2015-02-10 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |