UT HCR006 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-04 - House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in HSTRUL
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-04 - House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in HSTRUL
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Stockton Bar Geologic Formation Concurrent Resolution
Title
Stockton Bar Geologic Formation Concurrent Resolution
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-04 | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-02 | House Comm - Held in HSTNAE | |
2010-01-25 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2010-01-09 | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in HDOCKET | |
2010-01-09 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HDOCKET | |
2010-01-07 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2010-01-06 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2010/htmdoc/hbillhtm/HCR006.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2010/bills/hbillint/hcr006.pdf |