UT HCR004 | 2021 | General Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Concurrent Resolution Condemning the Treatment of the Uighur Ethnic Community by the Chinese Government

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concurrent Resolution Condemning the Treatment of the Uighur Ethnic Community by the Chinese Government

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-27 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-05HouseHouse/ filed in House file for bills not passed
2021-03-05HouseHouse/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2021-03-05HouseSenate/ to House in Clerk of the House
2021-03-05SenateSenate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary
2021-03-04SenateSenate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-03-04SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-03-04SenateSenate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-01-28SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2021-01-28SenateSenate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2021-01-27SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2021-01-27SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
2021-01-27HouseHouse/ floor amendment # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-01-27HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-01-25HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-01-25HouseHouse/ committee report favorable in House Judiciary Committee
2021-01-22HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Judiciary Committee
2021-01-20HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Judiciary Committee
2021-01-19HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2021-01-19HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House
2021-01-13HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2021-01-11 LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2021-01-06 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2021-01-06 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2021-01-06 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback