UT HCR003 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concurrent Resolution Supporting Cannabis Research

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concurrent Resolution Supporting Cannabis Research

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-07 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-10HouseHouse/ filed in House file for bills not passed
2016-03-10 House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House
2016-03-07HouseHouse/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in House Rules Committee
2016-03-07HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2016-03-07HouseHouse/ committee report favorable in House Health and Human Services Committee
2016-03-07HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Health and Human Services Committee
2016-02-18HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Health and Human Services Committee
2016-01-25HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2016-01-20 House/ received bill from Legislative Printing in Clerk of the House
2016-01-19 LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2016-01-18 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2016-01-18 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2016-01-18 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback