UT HCR003 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-25 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concurrent Resolution Recognizing the 100th Anniversary of the Settlement of Clarion, Utah

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concurrent Resolution Recognizing the 100th Anniversary of the Settlement of Clarion, Utah

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-25 Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
2015-03-19 House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor
2015-03-17 House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House
2015-03-17 Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House
2015-03-04 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2015-02-27 Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2015-02-26 House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2015-02-26HouseHouse/ received from Senate in House Speaker
2015-02-26HouseSenate/ to House in House Speaker
2015-02-26HouseSenate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker
2015-02-26SenateSenate/ passed 3rd reading in Senate President
2015-02-26SenateSenate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2015-02-25SenateSenate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2015-02-25SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2015-02-24SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2015-02-24SenateSenate/ committee report favorable in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee
2015-02-23SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee
2015-02-19SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee
2015-02-18SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2015-02-18 Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2015-02-17SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2015-02-17SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
2015-02-17HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House Consent Calendar
2015-02-12HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House Consent Calendar
2015-02-12HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in House Political Subdivisions Committee
2015-02-11HouseHouse Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in House Political Subdivisions Committee
2015-02-11HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Political Subdivisions Committee
2015-02-10HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Political Subdivisions Committee
2015-02-09HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee
2015-02-07HouseLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee
2015-02-06HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2015-02-06 House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2015-02-05 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2015-02-05 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2015-02-05 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback